Loy, Frank Yee-Chuan (CPSO#: 25016)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Feb 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Feb 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jan 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1972
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Feb 2012

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: February 29, 2012
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Frank Yee-Chuan Loy to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: this is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms please contact the College’s Registration Department):

I, Dr. Loy:


2) Acknowledge and agree that the College referred allegations of professional misconduct and incompetence to the Discipline Committee in a Notice of Hearing dated April 6, 2011 and October 21, 2011 (the “Notice of Hearing”).
3) Acknowledge and agree that, in exchange for an original copy of this Undertaking as executed by me, the College has agreed to withdraw the Notice of Hearing.
4) Hereby resign from the College effective February 29, 2012 (the “Effective Date”).
5) Hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction after the Effective Date.
6) Agree that in the event that the College should became aware that I have applied for a licence to practise medicine in any jurisdiction after the Effective Date, the College shall, have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on the basis of a breach of this undertaking and, if successful, shall have the right to proceed with the specified allegations set out in the Notice of Hearing,
9) Undertake to the College that upon signing this Undertaking, I shall forward a request to the General Manager of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan (“OHIP”) that my billing number be deactivated for services rendered after the date I cease to practise.
11) Acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the terms and conditions provided in this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.
12) Consent to the terms of this undertaking being entered on the register as information that is available to the public.