Loy Son, Glenn Gordon (CPSO#: 82056)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 4 - 46
125 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J5
Phone: (519) 767-5163
Fax: (519) 767-5167
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Glenn Loy Son Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 09 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Loy Son ( CPSO# 82056 )

Business Address:
125 Delhi Street
Suite 4-46
Guelph ON  N1E 4J5
Phone Number: (519) 767-5163

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 10 May 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GLENN GORDON LOY SON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOY SON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Apr 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2010