Loy-English, Ingelise Joyce (CPSO#: 74112)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 07 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Resident 3 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Resident 4 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Resident 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 07 Sep 2011