Lozano, Andres (CPSO#: 52912)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Dec 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Dec 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Ottawa, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
West Wing 4-431
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-6200
Fax: (416) 603-5298
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lozano Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 12 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lozano ( CPSO# 52912 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
West Wing 4th Floor - 431
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-6200


Corporation Name: Massicotte Tymianski Gentili Mohammadzadeh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 20 2016

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 20 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDRES LOZANO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOZANO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 1985