Lozinski, Ala Zuzanna (CPSO#: 51023)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Aug 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: Lozinski, Alice Susan (used until: 26 May 1997 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:McMaster University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
15 Mountain Avenue South
Suite 312
Stoney Creek ON  L8G 2V6
Phone: (905) 664-5060
Fax: (905) 664-9972
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 15 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALA ZUZANNA LOZINSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOZINSKI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1987