Lozynsky, Oleg Alexander (CPSO#: 52193)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Jan 1987

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: Losynsky, Oleg Alexander (used until: 10 Apr 1984 )

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of New South Wales, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 21 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jan 1987