Lu, Cathy (CPSO#: 96585)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 16 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Calgary, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Oct 2014 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2011 to 14 Aug 2011
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 22 Aug 2011 to 16 Sep 2011
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Sep 2011