Lu, David Shin-Kuo (CPSO#: 57934)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:McGill University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 May 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Aug 2015