Lu, Diane Janet (CPSO#: 88274)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 May 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 May 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of National Defence
Directorate Forces Health Protectio
101 Colonel By Drive
Ottawa ON  K1A 0K2
Phone: 613-901-9381
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hôpital Montfort
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Canada
Phone: 613-746-4621
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Diane Lu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 17 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Lu ( CPSO# 88274 )

Business Address:
Department of National Defence
Directorate Forces health Protection
101 Colonel By Drive
Ottawa ON  K1A 0K2
Phone Number: (613) 901-9381

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIANE JANET LU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 May 2008