Lu, Lucy Xi (CPSO#: 95103)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: 905-895-4521
Fax: 905-853-2217
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

16700 Bayview Avenue
Suite 216
Newmarket ON  L3X 1W1
Canada
Phone: (905) 836-4173
Fax: (905) 836-9038
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Lu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 01 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Lu ( CPSO# 95103 )

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 28 Jul 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 27 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUCY XI LU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 17 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 18 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 17 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 18 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 29 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 28 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 29 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2015