Lu, Ying (CPSO#: 68032)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:Queen's University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 210
220 Duncan Mill Road
Toronto ON  M3B 3J5
Phone: (416) 444-7502
Fax: (416) 444-0025
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ying Lu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 12 2009


Corporation Name: Dr. Ying Lu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 04 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Lu ( CPSO# 68032 )

Business Address:
Suite 210
220 Duncan Mill Road
Toronto ON  M3B 3J5
Phone Number: (416) 444-7502

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YING LU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999