Lubbad, Nibal Khalil (CPSO#: 87327)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Russian

Education:Leningradskij Sanitarno Gigieniceskij Me, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grimsby Medical Clinic
520 North Service Rd- Unit 101
Grimsby ON  L3M 4E8
Phone: 905-945-9998
Fax: 905-945-8245
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lubbad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 12 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NIBAL KHALIL LUBBAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUBBAD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009