Lubczynski, Cecilia Margaret (CPSO#: 87556)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Sep 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Wroclaw, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Whitby Family Physicians
Suite 6
701 Rossland Road East
Whitby ON  L1N 8Y9
Phone: (905) 493-3447
Fax: (905) 493-4303
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lubczynski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lubczynski ( CPSO# 87556 )

Business Address:
701 Rossland Street East
Suite 6
Whitby ON  L1N 8Y9
Phone Number: (905) 493-3447

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 31 Aug 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CECILIA MARGARET LUBCZYNSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUBCZYNSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2007 to 26 Nov 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 27 Nov 2007 to 03 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2008 to 03 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2009