Lubelsky, Bruce Jack (CPSO#: 31969)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Sep 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1110 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 209
Toronto ON  M2K 2W2
Phone: (416) 229-4941
Fax: (416) 229-4940
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lubelsky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Lubelsky ( CPSO# 31969 )

Business Address:
209 - 1110 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 2W2
Phone Number: (416) 229-4941

Business Address:
125 - 1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (316) 494-0030

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 03 Dec 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRUCE JACK LUBELSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUBELSKY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1985