Lubitz, Paul Andrew (CPSO#: 73332)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 27 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 26 Apr 1999 to 04 Jun 1999
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 29 May 2000 to 27 Jun 2000
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 May 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jun 2000