Lubitz, Rebecca Jean (CPSO#: 87038)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Nov 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Univ of California, San Francisco, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
16 Andrew Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 5R2
Phone: (519) 804-9234
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

97 A Victoria
Kitchener ON  N2H 5C1
Canada
Phone: (519) 342-1616
Fax: (519) 513-9777
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rebecca Lubitz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 24 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Lubitz ( CPSO# 87038 )

Business Address:
16 Andrew Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 5R2
Phone Number: (519) 804-9234

Business Address:
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 783-0024

Business Address:
911 Queens Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 749-6578

Business Address:
97A Victoria Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 5C1
Phone Number: (519) 342-1616

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Jan 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REBECCA JEAN LUBITZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUBITZ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2008 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2009 to 31 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2010