Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Lucas, Alexandra Rose (CPSO#: 70833)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Sep 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Sep 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Alberta, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joes Medical Dignity Health
Division of Cardiology
200 W thomas Road
Phoenix AZ
Tempe AZ  85284
United States
Phone: 480-965-2392

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDRA ROSE LUCAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUCAS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1996
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2007