Luce, Anna Louise (CPSO#: 19311)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 10 Jun 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 May 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Sep 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Apr 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1996