Luce, Kiersten Anna (CPSO#: 64220)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 7
421 Greenbrook Drive
Kitchener ON  N2M 4K1
Phone: (519) 570-1655
Fax: (519) 570-3477
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Luce Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 02 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Luce ( CPSO# 64220 )

Business Address:
Unit 7
421 Greenbrook Drive
Kitchener ON  N2M 4K1
Phone Number: (519) 570-1655

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIERSTEN ANNA LUCE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUCE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1992