Luchsinger, Ingrid Sylvia (CPSO#: 33485)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Jun 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Chile, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Microbiology Effective: 03 Dec 1981 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 02 Dec 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jun 1995