Luck, Geoffrey Michael (CPSO#: 26954)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Geoffrey Luck Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 20 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Oshawa Clinic 117 King Street East Oshawa ON L1H 1B9
Date Received: 10 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1977 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017