Ludlow, Kyla Marie (CPSO#: 86376)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: Sorensen, Kyla Marie (used until: 11 Feb 2014 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1221 Lakeshore Rd, Suite 103
Burlington ON  L7S 0A1
Phone: (905) 333-8222
Fax: (905) 333-9343
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr, Kyla Ludlow Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 23 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ludlow ( CPSO# 86376 )

Business Address:
103 - 1221 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7S 0A1
Phone Number: (905) 333-8222

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Aug 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KYLA MARIE LUDLOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUDLOW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 25 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 26 Aug 2008 to 25 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2009