Ludwig, John James (CPSO#: 25608)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John James Ludwig Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 8 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent South Website: www.rsrs.com Tel: (416) 398-0638 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 28 May 2014

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2014

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 24 Oct 1989
Summary:

 In October 1989, Dr. Ludwig pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in 
 Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the records that are required 
 to be kept respecting his patients, contrary to s. 27(3); in that he contravened while engaged in 
 the practice of medicine a federal, provincial or municipal law, regulation or rule or a by-law of 
 a hospital designed to protect the public health, contrary to s. 27(20); in that he failed to 
 maintain the standard of practice of the profession, contrary to s. 27(21); and in that he engaged 
 in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the 
 circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
 unprofessional, contrary to s. 27(32).  The Discipline Committee accepted this plea and found Dr. 
 Ludwig guilty of professional misconduct.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Ludwig be 
 reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register.  The Committee also 
 ruled that the Doctor's licence to practice be suspended for a period of three months, but that 
 this suspension would itself be suspended if Dr. Ludwig undertook to attend the McMaster Physician 
 Review Program, with special emphasis on record-keeping and pharmacology and any remedial programs 
 recommended by the university, to the satisfaction of the Registrar, within one year of this Order 
 becoming final.  It was also stipulated that Dr. Ludwig authorize the release of a copy of the 
 Reasons for Decision and Penalty to McMaster prior to his attendance, that he pay the cost of the 
 above-noted programs, and that he agree to an inspection of his practice after two years of the 
 kind provided for under s. 64 of the Health Disciplines Act, 1980, as amended.

Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 22 Jan 1993
Hearing Date(s): 23 Oct 1989