Ludwin, Samuel Katzenellenbogen (CPSO#: 28784)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 04 Nov 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Nov 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Samuel K. Ludwin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 10 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 25 Mar 1975 RCPSC Specialist
Neuropathology Effective: 30 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Nov 2013