Luger, Sherry Glenna (CPSO#: 54064)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 01 Oct 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Oct 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1985
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 12 Oct 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 1992
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Oct 2001