Lui, Bosco Ting Man (CPSO#: 82416)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 5 & 6
8355 Woodbine Ave
Toronto ON  L3R 2P4
Phone: (289) 800-7128
Fax: (289) 800-9615
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bosco T. M. Lui Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 19 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Tang ( CPSO# 91145 )
Dr. B. Lui ( CPSO# 82416 )

Business Address:
5 & 6 - 8355 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 2P4
Phone Number: (289) 800-7128

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BOSCO TING MAN LUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2010