Lui, Jaime (CPSO#: 84678)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Eglinton Avenue East, Suite 604
Toronto ON  M4P3A1
Phone: 416-485-0555
Fax: 416-485-2555
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAIME LUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008