Lui, Kim Choy (CPSO#: 68741)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 19 Dec 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Dec 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kim C. Lui Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 9 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2010
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 19 Dec 2011

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 19 Dec 2011
Summary:

 On December 19, 2011, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Kim Choy Lui committed an act of 
 professional misconduct, in that he engaged in the sexual abuse of a patient, and in that he 
 engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard 
 to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
 unprofessional.

During the gynecological portion of a physical examination, Dr. Lui touched 
 Patient A's vagina in a manner that was sexual in nature, began to lick Patient A's genital area, 
 including her clitoris, and made inappropriate comments to Patient A. During the appointment, Dr. 
 Lui disclosed details about his personal life to Patient A. Following the appointment, he 
 contacted Patient A and continued to disclose personal details to her. 

The Discipline Committee 
 ordered and directed that:  

1.	the Registrar revoke Dr. Lui's certificate of registration, 
 effective at 11:59 p.m. on December 19, 2011. 
2.	Dr. Lui appear before the panel to be 
 reprimanded.
3.	Dr. Lui reimburse the College for funding provided to patients under the program 
 required under section 85.7 of the Code, by posting an irrevocable letter of credit or other 
 security acceptable to the College by January 19, 2012, in the amount of $16,060.00. 
4.	Dr. Lui 
 shall within 30 days pay the College its costs of this proceeding in the amount of 
 $3,650.00.
5.	the results of this proceeding be included in the register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): December 19, 2011