Lui, Robert Chiu-Kay (CPSO#: 30567)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Sep 1987

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McGill University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Sep 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Sep 1987