Luison, Fabio (CPSO#: 65086)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 402
2009 Long Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 6C3
Phone: (705) 523-5626
Fax: (705) 523-0827
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Fabio Luison Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Luison ( CPSO# 65086 )

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1

Business Address:
Suite 402
2009 Long Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 6C3
Phone Number: (705) 523-5626

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 24 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FABIO LUISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUISON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 6 - Thoracic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Resident 8 - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1993