Luk, Samuel Sai Kit (CPSO#: 33689)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Aug 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 8
360 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3Y7
Phone: (905) 881-0900
Fax: (905) 881-0906
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

60 Scottfield Drive
Scarborough ON  M1S 5T7
Canada
Phone: (416) 940-4818
Fax: (416) 292-1709
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Samuel S. Luk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 07 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Luk ( CPSO# 33689 )

Business Address:
Suite 8
360 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3Y7
Phone Number: (905) 881-0900

Business Address:
60 Scottfield Drive
Scarborough ON  M1S 5T7
Phone Number: (416) 940-4818

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMUEL SAI KIT LUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1982