Lukaszewska-Andziak, Bozenna (CPSO#: 53693)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jan 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Warsaw, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 207
14 Prince Arthur Avenue
Toronto ON  M5R 1A9
Phone: (416) 927-9595
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Poland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 16 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BOZENNA LUKASZEWSKA-ANDZIAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUKASZEWSKA-ANDZIAK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 1988