Luke, Sze Kong (CPSO#: 21438)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 14 Nov 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1968
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 06 Oct 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jul 2004