Luke, William Paul (CPSO#: 53689)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 1988

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Boston University, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1982
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1988
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1988