Lukeman, Richard Lyons (CPSO#: 17821)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1962 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 1961
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Mar 1964
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1992