Lukezich, Joseph Tony (CPSO#: 26735)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 16 Oct 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Oct 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Jan 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1991
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2005
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2005
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 16 Oct 2006

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 15 Aug 2006
Summary:

 On August 15, 2006, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Joseph Lukezich to have committed acts of 
 professional misconduct in that he sexually abused a patient and engaged in acts relevant to the 
 practice of medicine that would reasonably be regarded as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
 unprofessional.

On October 16, 2006 the discipline Committee ordered the following: 

1.	Directs 
 the Registrar to revoke Dr. Lukezich(s certificate of registration effective immediately.  

2.   
 	Requires that Dr. Lukezich appear before the panel to be reprimanded on a date no later than 3 
 months from the date this order becomes final. 

 	3. 	  Requires that Dr. Lukezich reimburse the 
 College for funding provided for the complainant under the program required under section 85.7 of 
 the Code. 

 	4. 	Requires Dr. Lukezich to post security acceptable to the College to guarantee 
 the payment of any amounts Dr. Lukezich may be required to reimburse the College pursuant to 
 paragraph 5 of this Order.  

Therefore, the certificate of registration in the Province of 
 Ontario issued in the name of Dr. Joseph Tony Lukezich is revoked effective October 16, 2006 at 
 12:00 noon.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Nov 01, 2005