Lukitto, Karolinah (CPSO#: 85233)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Indonesian

Education:UNIVERSITAS PADJADJARAN, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone: 5196212330
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 03 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAROLINAH LUKITTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUKITTO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2014