Lukovic, Jelena (CPSO#: 98312)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Radiation Oncology
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: 2262682964
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JELENA LUKOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUKOVIC is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017