Lulic-Hrvojic, Ana (CPSO#: 52268)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English

Education:University of Zagreb, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 200 - 2333 Dundas Street West Toronto ON M6R 3A6
Date Received: 31 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 18 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017