Lulja, Nevila (CPSO#: 87668)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Albanian, English

Education:Universiteti i Tiranes, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
York Medical Health Centre
Unit C
17215 Leslie Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8E4
Phone: (905) 853-0404
Fax: (905) 853-3702
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

181 Green Lane East
EAST GWILLIMBURY ONTARIO
Newmarket ON  L9N 0C9
Canada
Phone: (905) 868-9243
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lulja Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 06 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Lulja ( CPSO# 87668 )

Business Address:
York Medical Health Centre
Unit C
17215 Leslie Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8E4
Phone Number: (905) 853-0404

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEVILA LULJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LULJA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2007 to 26 Nov 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 27 Nov 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 18 Apr 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 May 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 May 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2010