Lultschik, Peter (CPSO#: 55762)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Oct 1990 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 31 Mar 1990
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 May 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2005