Lum, Pooitsing Andrea (CPSO#: 53067)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Aug 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
800 Commissioners Road East
Room C1-611
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 55003
Fax: (519) 667-6771
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. A. Lum Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Lum ( CPSO# 53067 )

Business Address:
C1-611 - 800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 31 May 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. POOITSING ANDREA LUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1990