Lumb, Barry James (CPSO#: 51026)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jun 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 43893
Fax: (905) 381-7032
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Barry Lumb Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 19 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Lumb ( CPSO# 51026 )

Business Address:
Henderson General Hospital
Suite A3 - 54
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 02 Dec 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARRY JAMES LUMB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUMB is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 1984