Lund, Chad Romney (CPSO#: 79042)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 22 Oct 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Oct 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 22 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 02 Nov 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 03 Nov 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 24 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Oct 2010