Lundquist, Ahti Sven Mathias (CPSO#: 14660)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1953

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 15 Nov 1960 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1954
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2009