Luo, Yigang (CPSO#: 74522)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:West China Medical University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ellis Hall, Rm 161
Royal University Hospital
103 Hospital Drive
Saskatoon SK  S7N 0W8
Phone: (306) 844-1087
Fax: (306) 844-1522
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1608 Tecumseh Rd W.
Windsor ON  N9B 1T8
Canada
Phone: (519) 258-4400
Fax: (519) 973-3914
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

1702 20th Street West
St Paul Hospital
Saskatoon SK  S7M 0Z9
Canada
Phone: (306) 655-5319
Fax: (306) 655-5946
County: 
Electoral District: 
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yigang Luo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Luo ( CPSO# 74522 )

Business Address:
Windsor Medical Clinic
1608 Tecumseh Road West
Windsor ON  N9B 1T8
Phone Number: (519) 258-4400

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Mar 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YIGANG LUO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Apr 2002
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 May 2002 to 31 Oct 2002
International Specialist Physician - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Feb 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 13 Feb 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Nov 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 20 Nov 2007
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 17 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2008