Luong, Angela (CPSO#: 70334)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto East General Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
H Wing, 1st floor
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-6580 Ext. 6075
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Angela Luong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Luong ( CPSO# 70334 )

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
H Wing - 1st Floor
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-6075

Business Address:
Parkmount Medical Imaging
215 - 840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Providence Health Care,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANGELA LUONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001