Luong, Loan Tuyet (CPSO#: 81040)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Dec 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Dec 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
P.O. Box 770
215 Van Buren Street
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone: (613) 258-2486
Fax: (613) 258-4183
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Loan T. Luong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 15 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Luong ( CPSO# 81040 )

Business Address:
215 Van Buren Street
PO Box 770
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone Number: (613) 258-2486

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LOAN TUYET LUONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2006