Lupe, Krystine Kimberly (CPSO#: 79018)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Apr 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Apr 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Radiation Oncology
PO Box 904
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-6111
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lupe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 02 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Lupe ( CPSO# 79018 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Radiation Oncology
PO Box 904
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-6111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 23 May 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRYSTINE KIMBERLY LUPE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUPE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 16 May 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 17 May 2008 to 16 May 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2010