Lupien, Joseph Rene Guy (CPSO#: 53269)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St-Joseph Island Medical Centre
1186 Richards St.
P.O.Box # 236
Richards Landing ON  P0R 1J0
Phone: (705) 246-2477
Fax: (705) 246-0487
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Lupien Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lupien ( CPSO# 53269 )

Business Address:
135 Dawson Street
Thessalon ON  P0R 1L0

Business Address:
1180 Richards Street
Richards Landing ON  P0R 1J0
Phone Number: (705) 246-2775

Business Address:
Bridgelink Medical Centre
1186 Richards Street
Richards Landing ON  P0R 1J0
Phone Number: (705) 246-2477

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Shore Health Network Blind River

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1985 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH RENE GUY LUPIEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUPIEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985